judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00014-CV
09-81-00014-CV
09/28/1981
Automobile Personal Injury
Stubbs, Ronald, et al
Dabney, Curtis, et al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/1982Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/17/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/13/1982Writ Filed
04/15/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/31/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/18/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
02/04/1982Submitted
01/25/1982Brief Filed
01/18/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/21/1981Brief Filed
11/24/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/02/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/05/1981Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/28/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
88th District Court
Hardin
Honorable Jack R. King
21,905