judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00294-CV
04-81-00294-CV
09/29/1981
Injunction
Guerra, Cipriano F.
Robertson, William G. and Patricia F.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/1982Mandate Issued
01/28/1982Mandate Issued
11/04/1981Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/04/1981Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1981Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/16/1981No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/01/1981No Description Available.
09/29/1981Record Filed
09/29/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/28/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
73rd Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Rose Spector
81-CI-13649