judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00204-CR
07-89-00204-CR
06/12/1989
Robbery
Jimerson, James William
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/10/1991Mandate Issued
03/25/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/10/1990Submitted
09/10/1990Submission
08/14/1990Submission
11/10/1989Brief Filed
11/10/1989Case ready to be set
10/16/1989Brief Filed
09/15/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
09/14/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/16/1989Do not use
08/16/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
06/22/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
06/12/1989Do not use
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/10/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
137th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Cecil G. Puryear
87-407213
75 yrs. $6,000.00