judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00236-CV
13-89-00236-CV
06/12/1989
Contract
Rayburn, Charles N.
Omniflight Offshore, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1991Mandate Issued
02/06/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/19/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
12/03/1990Supreme Court Number
11/15/1990Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
11/02/1990Writ of Error Fee Paid
11/01/1990Writ Filed
10/04/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedOverruled
10/04/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/14/1990Miscellaneous Motion
09/05/1990Motion for rehearing filed
07/31/1990Motion to extend time to file rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/16/1990Extension of time to file Mo. for Rehear
06/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/07/1989Submitted
12/07/1989Submission
11/28/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
11/16/1989Motion for Oral Argument DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/31/1989Motion to allow oral argument.
10/23/1989Letter sent
10/18/1989Submission
09/05/1989Oral argument requested
09/05/1989Brief Filed
08/31/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/11/1989Brief Filed
08/11/1989No oral argument requested
08/11/1989Appellant's Brief Received
08/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/12/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/27/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
06/19/1989Filing Fee Paid
06/12/1989Transcript Filed
06/12/1989Transcript Received
06/12/1989Address Change
06/12/1989Due date for record to be filed
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rayburn, Charles N.AppellantHon. John A. Rank III
Omniflight Offshore, Inc.AppelleeJames W. Wray, Jr.
Trial Court Information
148th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Margarito Garza
87-5442-E