judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-89-00036-CR
06-89-00036-CR
06/12/1989
Other Drug Possession
Smith, Clyde Keith
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/20/1990Mandate issued
06/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/08/1990Submitted
05/08/1990Submission
04/20/1990Brief Filed
03/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/01/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/27/1990Brief Filed
02/27/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/20/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/13/1990Motion DisposedOverruled
02/05/1990MOTION FILED
01/09/1990Motion DisposedOverruled
01/09/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/03/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/03/1990MOTION FILED
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/31/1989Order issued
10/27/1989Response to Motion
10/24/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/1989Motion to substitute counsel
09/06/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/21/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/18/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/10/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/21/1989Transcript Filed
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/10/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
71st District Court
Harrison
Honorable Bonnie Leggat
88-0258
20 years TDC - $5,000 fine