judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-00784-CR
05-81-00784-CR
09/29/1981
Burglary of a Building
Michael Eugene Wright
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/19/1982Supplemental brief filedAppellant
06/18/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/15/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
11/04/1982Reply to response or motion filed
10/29/1982Letter filed
10/29/1982Letter received
10/28/1982Motion for rehearing filed
10/25/1982Letter filed
09/20/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/19/1982Supplemental brief filed
06/18/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/16/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/17/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/15/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/07/1982Letter issued by the court
04/07/1982Letter received
03/17/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/15/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/15/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/18/1981Reporters record filed
12/18/1981Clerks record filed
09/29/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/20/1982Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 2
F81-4459-PI
Life TDC