judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-00783-CR
05-81-00783-CR
09/29/1981
Extradition
Jeffery Hudson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/21/2017Order enteredDestroy
05/12/2017Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/16/1981Judgment Issued
10/15/1981Order issuedWithdrawn
10/15/1981Motion to withdraw appeal filed
09/29/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hudson, JefferyCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 282nd District Court
X81-08285-S