judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00235-CV
13-89-00235-CV
06/12/1989
Contract
Life Insurance Company of the Southwest
Aldrich, Kenneth
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/24/1991Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
01/10/1991Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/09/1991Mandate Issued
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/07/1990Copy of an order
02/22/1990Letter sent
02/21/1990Letter sent
02/21/1990Submitted
02/21/1990Submission
02/20/1990Letter sent
02/20/1990Letter sent
02/13/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
01/17/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/10/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
12/20/1989Submission
09/28/1989Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
09/22/1989Response to _____________.
09/15/1989Sworn Statement filed
09/13/1989Motion for leave to file brief
09/12/1989List of Authorities
09/06/1989Appellee's Brief Received
09/06/1989Brief Filed
09/06/1989Oral argument requested
08/07/1989Brief Filed
08/07/1989Oral argument requested
08/07/1989Case ready to be set
07/07/1989Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
07/07/1989Filing Fee Paid
07/07/1989Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript
07/06/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
07/06/1989Exhibits Filed
07/06/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/06/1989Due date for record to be filed
06/22/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
06/22/1989Supplemental transcript filed
06/21/1989Filing Fee Paid
06/12/1989Transcript Received
06/12/1989Transcript Filed
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
197th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Darrell Hester
01-85-203-C