judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00310-CR
04-81-00310-CR
09/28/1981
Robbery
Martinez, Angel L.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/18/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
08/18/1983Mandate Issued
08/18/1983Mandate Issued
08/17/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
07/20/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
05/17/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/09/1983Petition for Review Filed
04/29/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/30/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/23/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/23/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/15/1982Submission
09/15/1982Submission
09/15/1982Submitted
08/25/1982Motion to Make Available a Document DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/12/1982Brief Filed
05/12/1982Motion to Make Available a Document Filed
12/08/1981Case ready to be set
12/08/1981Brief Filed
12/08/1981Case ready to be set
11/12/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/1981Brief Filed
10/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/28/1981Record Filed
09/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/16/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Ted Butler
80-CR-1992-B
5 years