judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00309-CR
04-81-00309-CR
09/28/1981
Capital Murder
Martinez, Angel L.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/09/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
12/09/1983Mandate Issued
12/09/1983Mandate Issued
12/08/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
11/16/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
08/11/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/08/1983Petition for Review Filed
07/07/1983Motion for Rehearing En Banc DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/07/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/15/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedFiling is Moot
06/15/1983Motion f/l/file Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/06/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/06/1983Motion f/l/file Rehearing Filed
06/02/1983Motion for Rehearing En Banc Filed
06/02/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/18/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/18/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/15/1982Submission
09/15/1982Submission
09/15/1982Submitted
08/25/1982Motion to Make Available a Document DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/11/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/04/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
06/04/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
05/12/1982Motion to Make Available a Document Filed
05/12/1982Brief Filed
12/17/1981Supplemental Brief Filed
12/08/1981Case ready to be set
12/08/1981Brief Filed
12/08/1981Case ready to be set
11/09/1981Brief Filed
10/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/28/1981Record Filed
09/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/16/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
80-CR-2430
12 years