judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00296-CR
04-81-00296-CR
09/28/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Labarge, Gregory Lee
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/1987Mandate Issued
11/13/1987Mandate Issued
11/12/1987Case Returned from Higher Court
10/14/1987Higher Court DecisionRefused
01/08/1985Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/21/1984Petition for Review Filed
11/28/1984No New Event but Update in Calendar
11/07/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/07/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/30/1984Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1984Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/29/1984Motion to Supplement Record Filed
10/29/1984Motion for Leave Filed
10/17/1984Appeal Reinstated
10/17/1984Appeal Reinstated
10/17/1984Submission
10/17/1984Submitted
01/05/1984No Description Available.
01/05/1984No Description Available.
01/04/1984No New Event but Update in Calendar
04/13/1983Opinion issuedAbated
04/13/1983Opinion issuedAbated
04/12/1983Case ready to be set
04/12/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/1983No Description Available.
04/08/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
04/07/1983Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/07/1983No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/06/1983Submission
04/06/1983Submission
04/06/1983Submitted
04/05/1983Supplemental Brief Received
04/05/1983Motion to Supplement Record Filed
04/05/1983No Description Available.
04/05/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
11/30/1981Motion to Strike DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/13/1981Motion to Strike Filed
11/12/1981Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/05/1981Motion to Supplement Record Filed
11/05/1981Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law Filed
10/22/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
10/22/1981Case ready to be set
10/19/1981Brief Filed
10/19/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/28/1981Brief Filed
09/28/1981Record Filed
09/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/16/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/22/1981Record Approved
11/21/1980Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/18/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
11/13/1987Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
79-CR-2993-B
75 Years