judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00129-CV
02-89-00129-CV
06/12/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Neel, Ronnie Alan and Sally Lou Neel
Upshaw, Leroy
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/10/1990Mandate Issued
06/26/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/08/1990Response Filed
05/30/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed in Part and Reversed & Rendered in Part
01/09/1990Order Entered
01/09/1990Submitted
01/09/1990Submission
11/20/1989No Description Available.
10/31/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Motion Filed
09/26/1989Brief Filed
09/08/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/15/1989Brief Filed
07/26/1989Submission
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/11/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/11/1989No Description Available.
06/23/1989Request for Extension of Recorder's Record DisposdMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1989No Description Available.
06/20/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/20/1989Response Filed
06/12/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/10/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
97th District Court
Montague
Honorable Michael Schattman
86M-213