judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00102-CV
08-81-00102-CV
09/28/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Hester, Ora
Grayson, Bonnie May, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/15/2003Case file destroyed - case has met retention schedule and had no historical value to this court
06/04/1984Shuck purged
04/15/1983Mandate Issued
03/22/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
01/03/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/23/1982No description available.
11/24/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/10/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/27/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/27/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/08/1982Submitted
10/08/1982Submission
10/08/1982Submitted
08/18/1982Submission
04/14/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/14/1982Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/1982Brief Filed
04/12/1982No description available.
04/09/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
03/29/1982Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
03/25/1982No description available.
03/23/1982Supplemental Transcript Filed
03/15/1982Brief Filed
03/15/1982Case ready to be set
01/22/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1982Statement of Facts Filed
01/22/1982Transcript Filed
01/11/1982No description available.
12/16/1981No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/30/1981No description available.
10/14/1981No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/28/1981No description available.
09/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/22/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1983Case StoredCourt has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
3851