judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00155-CR
02-89-00155-CR
06/12/1989
Robbery
Tomlin, Danny Ray
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/1991Mandate Issued
11/20/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/15/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/04/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Submission
03/16/1990Brief Filed
03/13/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/08/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/10/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/15/1989Brief Filed
12/15/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1989Submission
12/12/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/06/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/05/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
06/12/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tomlin, Danny RayCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Clifford Davis
0304568D
Life, TDC