judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00285-CR
04-81-00285-CR
09/28/1981
Rape
Solis, Reynaldo, a/k/a El Diablo
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/22/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/21/1983Mandate Issued
04/21/1983Mandate Issued
02/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/12/1983Submission
01/12/1983Submission
01/12/1983Submitted
09/28/1981Brief Filed
09/28/1981Record Filed
09/28/1981Case ready to be set
09/28/1981Brief Filed
09/28/1981Case ready to be set
09/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
49th Judicial District Court
Zapata
Honorable Ruben Garcia
483
20 years