judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00148-CV
09-89-00148-CV
06/12/1989
Probate of Will Contests
Hunter, Elaine James
Estate of John Warford James, Deceased
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/29/1991Mandate Issued
04/17/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
04/10/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/27/1991Petition for WritMotion or Writ Denied
12/07/1990Petition for WritFiled in Higher Court
12/06/1990Memorandum to Clerk
12/04/1990Petition for Writ
11/01/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/26/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/25/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
07/25/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/25/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
07/25/1990Supplemental Brief Received
07/10/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
07/09/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
07/09/1990Supplemental Brief Received
05/03/1990Submitted
05/03/1990Submission
03/23/1990Submission
08/04/1989Brief Filed
08/04/1989Case ready to be set
07/10/1989Brief Filed
06/12/1989Transcript Filed
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/29/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Elaine James HunterAppellantWalter L. Borgfeld, Jr.
Joni M. HannaAppelleeLloyd C. Martin
Hunter, Elaine JamesAppellantCary Kirby
Elaine Hanna KoischAppelleeLloyd C. Martin
Sally Winkler BarnesAppelleeLloyd C. Martin
Trial Court Information
County Court
Polk
Honorable Stephen L. Phillips
3521