judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00149-CR
09-89-00149-CR
06/12/1989
ATTEMPTED MURDER
Guidry, Forest Steven
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/05/1990Mandate Issued
12/20/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/30/1989Brief Filed
08/30/1989Case ready to be set
08/11/1989Brief Filed
07/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/13/1989Transcript Filed
06/12/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
51091
20 years - TDC