judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DODSON (DERRECK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33500
Short Caption:DODSON (DERRECK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C150406Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/21/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/21/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00463
12/21/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Jury Trial, Wednesday, July 22, 1998. Court Reporter: Robert H. Mintun. 98-00466
01/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1 [We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99A CY/MS/ML. 99-00278
02/10/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-00920
02/10/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/25/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 19, 1999. 99-00920