judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEV HILLMAN V. RESIDENTIAL FUNDING COMPANY

Case Information: 10-CV-1513
Short Caption:DEV HILLMAN V. RESIDENTIAL FUNDING COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB12617-08Filed Date:11/29/2010

Opening Event Date:11/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/01/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDev Hillman NPro SeN
AppelleeResidential Funding CompanyN
Stephen O. HesslerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 29, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
12/27/2010RECORD INDEX
12/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/17/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 5, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
03/11/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 17, 2011, directing appellant to submit the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
03/11/2011DISMISSED
04/01/2011MANDATE ISSUED