judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00120-CV
08-81-00120-CV
10/05/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Pope, Bobby W.
City of Dallas
No
5th Court of Appeals
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
08/05/1982Mandate Issued
06/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/04/1982Shuck purged
01/26/1982Submitted
01/26/1982Submission
01/26/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Transcript Filed
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
68th District Court
Dallas
80-212-C
n/a