judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00121-CV
08-81-00121-CV
10/05/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Rohdie, Robert C.
Washington,Dale dba Dale's Home Repairs
No
5th Court of Appeals
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/04/1984Shuck purged
05/04/1983No description available.
04/26/1983No description available.
04/15/1983Mandate Issued
04/11/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtOverruled
03/30/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
10/21/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/14/1982Application for Writ of Error
09/15/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/13/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
09/02/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/18/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/18/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/27/1982Submitted
01/27/1982Submission
01/27/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/05/1981Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/05/1981Transcript Filed
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
80-10626-C