judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00154-CR
08-81-00154-CR
10/05/1981
Other Felony
Koustoubardis, Christopher
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
06/30/1982Mandate Issued
05/14/1982Case Returned from Higher Court
05/11/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
05/06/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/03/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
03/10/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/10/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/29/1982Submitted
01/29/1982Submission
01/29/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/30/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
79-613-B
30 days + $200. (probated)