judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00142-CR
08-81-00142-CR
10/05/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Tubbs, Katherine Ann
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
09/10/1982Mandate Issued
07/14/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/14/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/06/1982No description available.
07/06/1982Record filed.
04/07/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/28/1982Submitted
01/28/1982Submission
01/28/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/10/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Honorable Ron Chapman
F79-5129-JH
life