judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROGERS VS. 8TH JUD DIST CT C/W 32528

Case Information: 33495
Short Caption:ROGERS VS. 8TH JUD DIST CT C/W 32528Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 32528 *, 33495Related Case(s): 32528
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A384787Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/09/2000 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:05/09/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Woods & Erickson-check no. 6595.
12/18/1998Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Writ of Mandamus or other Extraordinar Relief. 98-00439
01/22/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Strike Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief. 99-00444
01/29/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation Extending Time (opposition to motion to strike) 99-00659
02/03/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Petitioners shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file an opposition to the January 22, 1999 motion to strike the petition. 99-00742
02/05/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Strike Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Writ. 99-00826
03/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[We deny the motion to strike, without prejudice to real parties' in interest ability to raise the same arguments in their answer.] 99-01503
03/25/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Real Parties in Interest, Werner, et al., to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief. 99-02165
01/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. We conclude that in the interest of judicial economy these matters should be consolidated. We hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters. Nos. 32528, 33495. 00-01340
03/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for May 9, 2000 at the hour of 11:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(Nos. 32528 and 33495) (SNP99B-WM/MS/NB) 00-05005
04/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-06421
05/09/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 32528, 33495.
08/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Reversing District Court Order and Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we reverse the order of the district court and remand this matter to the district court with instructions to reinstate the decision of the Board approving an R-2 PUD zoning change." fn1[In light of this disposition, the petitioners' petition for a writ of mandamus is denied as moot.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. Nos. 32528, 33495. Document No. 00-13949.
08/30/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Respondents' Petition for Rehearing (nos. 33495/32525). Received L.V. drop box 8/28/00. 00-15235
08/30/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Harrision firm-check no. 19740 (nos. 33495/32528).
03/07/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 32528/33495 01-04110
03/21/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Mailed on: March 19, 2001. LV Dropbox. Nos. 32528/33495 (01-04961)
03/23/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-04166
03/23/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/08/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Denying Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. We have reviewed the petition, and we conclude that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. " . . . we deny the petition." EN BANC-WM/CY/MS/DA/RR/ML/NB. Nos. 32528/33495 (01-07668)