judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEITH ALLAN LEYVA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0034)
Case Number:S-09-0034Case Docketed On:02/20/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:KEITH ALLAN LEYVA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEITH ALLAN LEYVA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKeith Allan LeyvaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2009 WY 149
Citation:220 P.3d 791

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/20/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/09/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/22/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/29/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/15/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two Volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
11/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - copy of Motion for Sentence Reduction filed in trial court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/09/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/04/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal