judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAROL D. MOSS V. U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES

Case Information: 10-AA-1502
Short Caption:CAROL D. MOSS V. U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01858-10Filed Date:12/06/2010

Opening Event Date:12/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCarol D. Moss NPro SeN
RespondentU.S. Security AssociatesNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/06/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECVD ONLY).
12/06/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/13/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED as to the 9/24/10 ORDER and for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER as to the 11/5/10 ORDER as a motion for reconsideration does not toll the time for noting an appeal and is not independently appealable... It is *****MORE******
12/13/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS DENIED and petitioner shall simultaneously TENDER THE $100 FILING FEE. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal w/o further notice. (BY: ETW)
01/19/2011 On consideration of this court's December 13, 2010 order directing petitioner to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been untimely filed and further denied petitioner's mtoion to proceed IFP...AND no response having been filed, and it appearing that the filing fee has not been tendered, it is ORDERED that this PFR IS HEREBY STRICKEN AND DISMISSED for failure to comply. See DC App. R. 15 (e). (BY: ETW)
01/19/2011STRICKEN & DISMISSED
02/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED