judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00152-CR
08-81-00152-CR
10/05/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Sellers, Wendell Keith
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
09/22/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/22/1982Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
09/10/1982No description available.
09/10/1982Mandate Issued
06/23/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/23/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/29/1982Submitted
01/29/1982Submission
01/29/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/22/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
F79-4843-UP
60 yrs.