judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00056-CR
09-81-00056-CR
10/02/1981
Burglary
Glaze, Kenneth Ray
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/05/1984Mandate Issued
09/19/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
03/25/1983Petition for Review
05/24/1982Petition for ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
02/10/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/13/1981Brief Filed
10/19/1981Brief Filed
10/02/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/05/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
163rd District Court
Orange
Honorable David A. Dunn
B10,302
6 years TDC