judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00136-CR
08-81-00136-CR
10/05/1981
All Misdemeanors
Casselberry, Thomas W.
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
06/30/1982Mandate Issued
06/14/1982Case Returned from Higher Court
05/27/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
03/25/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
02/24/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/24/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/28/1982Submitted
01/28/1982Submission
01/28/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/30/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
78-5060-E
3 days & $50. (probated)