judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00147-CR
08-81-00147-CR
10/05/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Tappen, Robert Eugene
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
11/05/1982Mandate Issued
11/01/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
07/29/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/16/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
06/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/29/1982Submitted
01/29/1982Submission
01/29/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/05/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Honorable Ron Chapman
F80-1730-KH
life