judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00129-CR
08-81-00129-CR
10/05/1981
Marijuana Possession
Jones, Roderick Lynn
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
08/05/1982Mandate Issued
07/19/1982Case Returned from Higher Court
07/02/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
05/07/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
04/07/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/07/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/28/1982Submitted
01/28/1982Submission
01/28/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/05/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
F78-7369-IN
4 years