judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00149-CR
08-81-00149-CR
10/05/1981
Robbery
Alexander, Reginald
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
04/12/1984No description available.
09/19/1983No description available.
09/16/1983No description available.
05/04/1982Mandate Issued
03/03/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/03/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/29/1982Submitted
01/29/1982Submission
01/29/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/04/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 5
Dallas
F79-10543-RL
30 YEARS(Prior conviction)