judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00115-CV
08-81-00115-CV
10/05/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Williams, Brenda Joyce
City of Dallas, Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/04/1984Shuck purged
09/13/1982Mandate Issued
06/21/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/02/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/19/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/19/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/26/1982Submitted
01/26/1982Submission
01/26/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/05/1981Transcript Filed
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
79-10359-D
n/a