judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00111-CV
08-81-00111-CV
10/05/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Norman, Ralph
Bajaj, P. C. et al.
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
06/11/1982Mandate Issued
03/24/1982Motion - extend time to file a MFR - DisposedDismissed
03/24/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/22/1982Motion - extend time to file MFR - Filed
03/22/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
03/12/1982Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
03/12/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1982Submitted
01/25/1982Submission
01/25/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
44th District Court
Dallas
77-4947
n/a