judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00110-CV
08-81-00110-CV
10/05/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Williams, John
Stansbury, Robert H., Fednor Corp., et al
No
5th Court of Appeals
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/04/1984Shuck purged
08/20/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Granted
08/10/1982Application for Writ of Error
07/07/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/07/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/25/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
06/21/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
06/14/1982Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
06/14/1982Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
06/14/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/14/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1982Submission
01/25/1982Submission
01/25/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
75-4236-D
n/a