judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00126-CR
08-81-00126-CR
10/05/1981
Burglary
Rudd, Larry Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
06/11/1982Mandate Issued
03/10/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/10/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/28/1982Submitted
01/28/1982Submission
01/28/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
F79-3772-JI