judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00125-CV
08-81-00125-CV
10/05/1981
Contract
City of Balch Springs, Texas
American Fidelity
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
06/11/1982Mandate Issued
04/21/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/1982Judgment IssuedDismissed
04/08/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/27/1982Submission
01/27/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Transcript Filed
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
134th District Court
Dallas
79-3467-G