judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00113-CV
08-81-00113-CV
10/05/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Ellis, James E.
Life Insurance company of the Southwest
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/17/1991Fee paid
06/04/1984Shuck purged
11/05/1982Mandate Issued
11/01/1982Case Returned from Higher Court
10/25/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
10/05/1982Transcript Filed
07/30/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/26/1982Application for Writ of Error
06/23/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/11/1982Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
06/11/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/26/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/26/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1982Submitted
01/25/1982Submission
01/25/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Exhibits Filed
10/05/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/05/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
78-7976-D
n/a