judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00112-CV
08-81-00112-CV
10/05/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Stewart Ned L. & Harvey Lewis
American Industrial Linings, Inc. et al.,
No
5th Court of Appeals
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
11/03/1982Mandate Issued
10/25/1982Case Returned from Higher Court
09/15/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
07/26/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/21/1982Application for Writ of Error
06/23/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/17/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
06/09/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/04/1982Shuck purged
05/26/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
05/26/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
01/25/1982Submitted
01/25/1982Submission
01/25/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Reply brief filed.
10/05/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/05/1981Transcript Filed
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
192nd District Court
Dallas
80-5040-K
n/a