judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00134-CR
08-81-00134-CR
10/05/1981
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Davis, Timothy Blake
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
08/05/1982Mandate Issued
05/12/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/12/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/29/1982Submission
01/29/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/29/1981Submitted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/05/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Honorable JOHN C. VANCE
F79-7240-HM
25 yrs