judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00141-CR
08-81-00141-CR
10/05/1981
Burglary
Wilson, Bruce Patrick
Texas, The State of
No
5th Court of Appeals
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/01/1984Shuck purged
10/08/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/09/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
07/14/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/14/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/24/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/24/1982No description available.
06/09/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/09/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/28/1982Submitted
01/28/1982Submission
01/28/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/05/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/05/1981Case ready to be set
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
F78-10668-Q
life