judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00730-CR
14-81-00730-CR
10/15/1981
Auto Theft
Johnson, Derrell Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/18/1983Mandate Issued
05/19/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/05/1983Case ready to be set
06/04/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
05/07/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
02/11/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
10/15/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
270,008
4 yrs.