judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURCH (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33491
Short Caption:BURCH (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C26463Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/28/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/18/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00430
01/07/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order denying habeas corpus petition filed 11/30/98. Due Date: 10 days
01/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in district court on: 11/30/98. 99-00373
03/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33353, 33491, 33566, 33580, 33582, 33604, 33605, 33727. 99-01421
06/28/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 99-05652
06/28/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03353
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03738
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03738