judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TSAKNIS DENTAL GROUP V. SHAMEEKA PANNELL

Case Information: 10-AA-1499
Short Caption:TSAKNIS DENTAL GROUP V. SHAMEEKA PANNELLClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01955-10Filed Date:12/03/2010

Opening Event Date:12/03/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/15/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/24/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerTsaknis Dental GroupN
Jeffrey M. Hamberger YN
RespondentShameeka Pannell NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/03/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/03/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/07/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
12/15/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Tsaknis Dental Group is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
12/28/2010APPEARANCE- of Jeffrey M. Hamberger on behalf of petitioner
01/25/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcript
01/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/28/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/08/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF (no appendix)
03/18/2011 It appearing that the brief of petitioner, was filed with this court on March 8, 2011, and it further appearing that the appendix was due to be filed on or before March 9, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the appendix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of respondent shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (JAC)
03/31/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (will mail the motion to file late)
04/04/2011RECEIVED: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX (Did not comply w/rule 27)
04/12/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX (amended) which includes Rule 27
04/22/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for leave to file the lodged appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's motion is granted and the lodged appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
04/22/2011APPENDIX
05/20/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
05/20/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
06/15/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STRIKE - respondent's filing and written document attached thereto
06/21/2011FiledTMC/motion to strike respondent's brief/OPPO/LODGED REPLY/LODED SUR REPLY
06/24/2011RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION to motion to strike.
10/17/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte, THAT THE CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED REPLY and SUR-REPLY...
10/17/2011FiledPETITIONER'S REPLY to Resp oppo to motion to mot to strike.
10/17/2011FiledReply to Petitioner's Reply to Appellee's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion To Strike. (Respondent)
10/17/2011FiledOrder Denying RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR MONETARY AWARD, GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENT'S BRIEF TO THE EXTENT and...
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/15/2011FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker
01/31/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
02/24/2012FiledMandate