judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY ALLEN WEISS v. KATHRYN BRINKMAN WEISS

Case Heading (S-09-0030)
Case Number:S-09-0030Case Docketed On:02/06/2009
Linked To: S-09-0068
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:GARY ALLEN WEISS v. KATHRYN BRINKMAN WEISS
Full Title:GARY ALLEN WEISS, Appellant (Defendant), v. KATHRYN BRINKMAN WEISS, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary Allen WeissLois Kimberly Weiss
AppelleeKathryn Brinkman WeissKenneth S. Cohen
Heather Noble
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemJean A. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 124
Citation:217 P.3d 408

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/06/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/06/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/13/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to extend time to file opening brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/16/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/08/2009Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
04/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Consolidate Appeals and for Coordinated Briefing ScheduleEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/10/2009Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant re brief due date. Suggested she file a motion for extension of time because brief due before response time on motion runs.EventPhone CallFinal
04/10/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's second motion to extend time to file opening brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/13/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/21/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
04/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Kathryn Weiss response to Gary Weiss motion to consolidate appeals.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2009Order - Consolidating cases and denying Motion for Coordinated Briefing ScheduleOrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/11/2009Event - Phone Call - from counsel for Appellant re citing to the unnumbered pages in Exhibit file. Suggested citing to actual name of document.EventPhone CallFinal
05/15/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/27/2009Event - Phone Call - Mr. Cohen not available for oral argument August 3-14th.EventPhone CallFinal
06/16/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Extend Time to File Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/19/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/16/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's brief regarding attorney's feesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/31/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2009Correspondence - Incoming from counsel for AppellantCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Lois Kimberly Weiss on behalf of Gary Allen Weiss.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/17/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes, each containing Original Papers, Exhibits & Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kenneth S. Cohen for Kathryn Weiss.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Lois Kimberly Weiss for appellant in S-09-0030; Kenneth S. Cohen for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/09/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming in S-09-0030 and dismissing and remanding in S-09-0068, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/23/2009Petition - Rehearing with memorandum in support.PetitionRehearingFinal
10/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant/Appellee's Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/02/2009Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from Mr. Cohen indicating that he does not intend to respond to petition for rehearing, requested issuance of mandate in S-09-0030.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/03/2009Motion - Other - Motion to strike improper ex parte communication by opposing counselMotionOtherFinal
11/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to strike improper ex parte communication by opposing counsel.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/06/2009Response/Objection - to petition for rehearing and motion to strike.Response/ObjectionExtensionFinal
11/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Kathryn Weiss Response to Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2009Order - Other - Order denying motion to strike; order denying motion to permit GAL to file memorandum in support of rehearing; and order granting, in part, petition for rehearing.OrderOtherFinal
11/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/10/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/18/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/16/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal