judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00727-CR
14-81-00727-CR
10/13/1981
Auto Theft
McWhorter, Daniel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/16/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
11/18/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/23/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/26/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
08/11/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
10/13/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
12th District Court
Grimes
10,717
2 yrs.