judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FOLOSADE A. PYNE V. MB STAFFING

Case Information: 10-AA-1501
Short Caption:FOLOSADE A. PYNE V. MB STAFFINGClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02053-10Filed Date:12/03/2010

Opening Event Date:12/03/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/18/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/13/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerFolosade A. Pyne NPro SeN
RespondentMb Staffing N
Thomas B. MartinYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/03/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/03/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/07/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
12/16/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
01/26/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcripts.
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 2, 2011, directing petitioner to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
04/07/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 45 days
04/22/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before May 23, 2011. (JAC)
05/23/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
05/23/2011APPENDIX
06/24/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
06/24/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/18/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Thompson, Belson
03/22/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED thatthe judgment on appeal is affirmed.)
04/13/2012FiledMandate