judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN EDWARD PAINOVICH v. JACQUELINE LOUISE PAINOVICH

Case Heading (S-09-0031)
Case Number:S-09-0031Case Docketed On:02/12/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:STEVEN EDWARD PAINOVICH v. JACQUELINE LOUISE PAINOVICH
Full Title:STEVEN EDWARD PAINOVICH, Appellant (Defendant), v. JACQUELINE LOUISE PAINOVICH, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven Edward PainovichJohn Matthew Kuker
James Michael Peterson
AppelleeJacqueline Louise PainovichJohn A. Zebre

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2009 WY 116
Citation:216 P.3d 501

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/12/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/12/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
03/30/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's opening brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
03/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's statement of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
04/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's request to be placed on Expedited DocketEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/15/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/02/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/09/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
09/22/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/08/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/16/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal