judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAY (TIMOTHY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33492
Short Caption:DAY (TIMOTHY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32671
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9301224CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/18/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00433
02/03/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1 [We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-00731
03/02/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01442
03/02/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/05/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 3, 1999. 99-01442