judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00332-CR
04-81-00332-CR
10/12/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Hernandez, Juan
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/16/1983Pet. for Writ of Habeas Corpus DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/14/1983Pet. for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed
03/04/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
02/28/1983Mandate Issued
02/28/1983Mandate Issued
01/12/1983Opinion issuedDismissed
01/12/1983Opinion issuedDismissed
10/12/1981Notice of appeal received
10/12/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
04/12/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
81-CR-0367
40 years